MO HB2237 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that certain residency requirements of a city of the fourth classification may be satisfied by certain conditions
Title
Specifies that certain residency requirements of a city of the fourth classification may be satisfied by certain conditions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |