MO HB2220 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to financial reports of political subdivisions and alternative county highway commissions
Title
Modifies provisions relating to financial reports of political subdivisions and alternative county highway commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-28 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-11 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-03-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2022-03-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-03-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-03-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2022-02-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |