MO HB221 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred: Select Committee on Local, State, Federal Relations and Miscellaneous Business(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Local, State, Federal Relations and Miscellaneous Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred: Select Committee on Local, State, Federal Relations and Miscellaneous Business(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Local, State, Federal Relations and Miscellaneous Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires United States Senators who represent Missouri to provide the General Assembly with certain information
Title
Requires United States Senators who represent Missouri to provide the General Assembly with certain information
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Local, State, Federal Relations and Miscellaneous Business(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-13 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB221&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0721H.01I.pdf |