MO HB2194 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to workers' compensation administrative law judges and repeals the position of chief legal counsel
Title
Modifies provisions relating to workers' compensation administrative law judges and repeals the position of chief legal counsel
Sponsors
Rep. Rudy Veit [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |