MO HB2180 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the time period within which the Missouri Commission on Human Rights must notify a person of his or her right to bring a civil action under the Human Rights Act
Title
Changes the time period within which the Missouri Commission on Human Rights must notify a person of his or her right to bring a civil action under the Human Rights Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Zerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-05-01 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-05-01 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-04-09 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2180&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB2180I.htm |