MO HB2121 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Farm-to-School Act
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Farm-to-School Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House: HB 2121 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 144 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 6, 2016, 12:00pm or upon morning recess, whichever is later, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |