MO HB2108 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the offense of organized retail theft and establishes provisions relating to disclosures by online marketplaces

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the offense of organized retail theft and establishes provisions relating to disclosures by online marketplaces

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-28HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2022-02-28HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2022-02-28HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2022-02-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2022-02-14HouseAction Postponed (H)
2022-02-14HouseExecutive Session Continued
2022-02-07HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2022-01-20HouseReferred: Crime Prevention(H)
2022-01-06HouseRead Second Time (H)
2022-01-05HouseRead First Time (H)
2021-12-29HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback