MO HB2108 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits actions for personal injury or death from being brought under the Merchandising Practices Act
Title
Prohibits actions for personal injury or death from being brought under the Merchandising Practices Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-03-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-03-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-03-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H) |
2018-01-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB2108&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5895H.01I.pdf |