MO HB2090 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that public administrators shall not be required to disclose their personal financial information in order to serve as guardian or conservator
Title
Specifies that public administrators shall not be required to disclose their personal financial information in order to serve as guardian or conservator
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 and HCA 2 AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2016-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2090&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2090I.PDF |