MO HB2084 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-24 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-24 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the new Interstate 70 bridge over the Mississippi River connecting Missouri and Illinois as the "Stan 'The Man' Musial Mississippi River Expressway Bridge"
Title
Designates the new Interstate 70 bridge over the Mississippi River connecting Missouri and Illinois as the "Stan 'The Man' Musial Mississippi River Expressway Bridge"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2012-04-17 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2012-03-30 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2084&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB2084I.htm |