MO HB208 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-25 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-25 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows community college police officers to establish regulations to control vehicular traffic on any thoroughfare owned or maintained by the college
Title
Allows community college police officers to establish regulations to control vehicular traffic on any thoroughfare owned or maintained by the college
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB208&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0603H.01I.pdf |