MO HB208 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds certain graphing calculators to the list of items that are exempt from sales tax during the annual sales tax holiday for school supplies
Title
Adds certain graphing calculators to the list of items that are exempt from sales tax during the annual sales tax holiday for school supplies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB208&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0208I.htm |