MO HB2073 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-26 - Referred: Financial Institutions (H)
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-26 - Referred: Financial Institutions (H)
Pending: House Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the provisions regarding nonjudicial foreclosure proceedings and requires all foreclosure proceedings to be handled judicially beginning August 28, 2012
Title
Repeals the provisions regarding nonjudicial foreclosure proceedings and requires all foreclosure proceedings to be handled judicially beginning August 28, 2012
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Referred: Financial Institutions (H) | |
2012-03-30 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2073&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB2073I.htm |