MO HB2072 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Executive Session - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Executive Session - No Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the criteria of health carrier programs that publicly assess and compare the quality and cost efficiency of health care providers
Title
Establishes the criteria of health carrier programs that publicly assess and compare the quality and cost efficiency of health care providers
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Ervin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2010-03-23 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred: Healthcare Transformation (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2010-02-09 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2072&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB2072I.htm |