MO HB207 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Missouri driver's license applicants to elect to have a medical alert notation placed on the person's driver's license or nondriver's identification card

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows Missouri driver's license applicants to elect to have a medical alert notation placed on the person's driver's license or nondriver's identification card

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House: HB 207 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 149 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-05-13SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-05-13SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-05-10SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 13, 2019, 1 p.m., Bingham Conference Room
2019-05-10SenateHearing Cancelled (S)
2019-05-09SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 10, 2019, 8:30am, Bingham Conference Room
2019-05-09SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-05-08SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-05-07SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-05-07SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-25SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-04-24SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 25, 2019, 8:20am, Senate Lounge
2019-03-26SenateSecond read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
2019-02-28HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-02-28HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-28HouseTaken Up
2019-02-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-27HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-25HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-02-21HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-02-20HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2019-02-20HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-02-20HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-02-20HouseTaken Up
2019-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-31HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-01-31HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-01-31HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-01-31HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-24HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-16HouseReferred: Transportation(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-10HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback