MO HB2053 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-31 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the school budgeting and planning process
Title
Changes the laws regarding the school budgeting and planning process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-31 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-31 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-17 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-17 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-03 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2010-02-24 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education (H) | |
2010-02-08 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |