MO HB2041 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Utilities AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Utilities AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Department of Natural Resources to promulgate rules for the management and closure of coal combustion residual surface impoundments and landfills
Title
Allows the Department of Natural Resources to promulgate rules for the management and closure of coal combustion residual surface impoundments and landfills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Utilities AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2018-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |