MO HB2040 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a qualified first responder to administer naloxone to a person suffering from an apparent narcotic or opiate-related overdose
Title
Allows a qualified first responder to administer naloxone to a person suffering from an apparent narcotic or opiate-related overdose
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Lynch [R] | Rep. Dave Hinson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-07 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 17, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health(S) |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-31 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 |
2014-03-31 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2014-03-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |