MO HB2032 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the process by which travel hardships are granted to public school pupils

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the process by which travel hardships are granted to public school pupils

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-07HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2018-02-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2018-02-06HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2018-02-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2018-01-30HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2018-01-11HouseReferred: Government Efficiency(H)
2018-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback