MO HB2029 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a sales tax exemption for replacement parts to aircraft
Title
Authorizes a sales tax exemption for replacement parts to aircraft
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-09 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 30 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted Do Pass: Senate Ways and Means |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 10, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 11 |
2014-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Small Business(H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |