MO HB2017 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates money for capital improvement
Title
Appropriates money for capital improvement
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 111 N: 13 NV: 25 Abs: 13) [PASS]
House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 111 N: 13 NV: 25 Abs: 13) [PASS]
House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 106 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 17 NV: 16 Abs: 12) [PASS]
House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 111 N: 13 NV: 25 Abs: 13) [PASS]
House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 111 N: 13 NV: 25 Abs: 13) [PASS]
House - House: HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 106 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
House - House: HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 17 NV: 16 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2024-06-28 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2024-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker (H) |
2024-05-13 | House | House Message (H) |
2024-05-10 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 111 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 25 |
2024-05-10 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS SCS AYES: 111 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 25 |
2024-05-10 | House | Taken Up |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS SCS |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 24 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2024-05-09 | Senate | SS Offered |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2024-04-29 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - CANCELLED - Friday, April 26, 2024, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - CANCELLED - Thursday, April 25, 2024, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 24, 2024, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 23, 2024, 1:30 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Appropriations(S) |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 17 PRESENT: 16 |
2024-04-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-04-02 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, adopted. |
2024-04-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2024-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2024-04-02 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 5, adopted. |
2024-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2024-04-02 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, adopted. |
2024-04-02 | House | Taken Up |
2024-04-02 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2024-04-02 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-03-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - with a time limit of six hours of debate on Perfection pursuant to Rule 24(4)(d). AYES: 32 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 2 |
2024-03-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |