MO HB2014 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates money for supplemental purposes
Title
Appropriates money for supplemental purposes
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Silvey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-04-27 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-04-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-04-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-04-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-04-24 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2012-04-24 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-04-23 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-04-23 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-03-01 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, MARCH 5, 2012, 12:00PM, SENATE COMMITTE ROOM 2 | |
2012-02-27 | Second Read and Referred: Appropriations (S) | |
2012-02-23 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-02-23 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 156 NOES: 0 | |
2012-02-21 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-02-21 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-08 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-08 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Referred: Budget (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |