MO HB2 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Substitute) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Substitute) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to the admissibility of certain witness statements
Title
Establishes provisions relating to the admissibility of certain witness statements
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Hovis [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 2 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 2 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 128 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 2 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 2 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 128 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-09-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-09-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-09-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Emergency Clause Defeated (S) - AYES: 22 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 22 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Taken Up |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Taken Up |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 5 to SA 1, pending |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - 2:00 p.m., Tuesday, September 1, 2020, Senate Chamber |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2020-08-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-08-25 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 128 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-08-25 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 133 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-08-25 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-08-24 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2020-08-24 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2020-08-24 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-08-24 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-08-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-08-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-08-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-08-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-08-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-08-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-08-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-08-12 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2020-08-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-07-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |