MO HB1993 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the State Highway Patrol to host a website where the public can determine whether a serial number of a firearm has been reported stolen.
Title
Requires the State Highway Patrol to host a website where the public can determine whether a serial number of a firearm has been reported stolen.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Mayhew [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1993&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4455H.01I.pdf |