MO HB1980 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the board of trustees of "The Firemens' Retirement System of St. Louis City" to act as trustees and administer other pension plans
Title
Allows the board of trustees of "The Firemens' Retirement System of St. Louis City" to act as trustees and administer other pension plans
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hinman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |