MO HB1973 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Second read and referred: Education(S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Second read and referred: Education(S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to school activities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to school activities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: HB 1973 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: HB 1973 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 (HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 (HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 84 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 (*HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 (*HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 (*HA 1 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 85 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 (*HA 1 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 60 N: 77 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: HB 1973 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 (HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 (HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 84 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 (*HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 (*HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 91 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 (*HA 1 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 85 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 (*HA 1 HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 60 N: 77 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 89 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: HB 1973 HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 90 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Second read and referred: Education(S) |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2022-04-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 95 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 3 |
2022-04-28 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2022-04-28 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2022-04-25 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, adopted. AYES: 90 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 2 |
2022-04-25 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To - AYES: 91 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-04-25 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2022-04-11 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-04-05 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2022-02-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2022-02-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2022-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-15 | House | Prefiled (H) |