MO HB1972 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a court to issue an order directing a wireless service provider to transfer the billing responsibility and rights to a wireless telephone number or numbers to a requesting party
Title
Authorizes a court to issue an order directing a wireless service provider to transfer the billing responsibility and rights to a wireless telephone number or numbers to a requesting party
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - House - House: HB 1972 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 145 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - voted do pass |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 26, 2016, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2016-04-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-04-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-18 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-13 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2016-04-13 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-01 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-24 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments Consent (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments - Consent (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred: Telecommunications(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |