MO HB1964 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding income tax
Title
Changes the laws regarding income tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-04-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-04-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-04-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-04-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2018-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |