MO HB1957 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to taxation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HousePlaced Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
2020-03-12HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2020-03-05HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-11HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2020-02-11HouseHCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-10HouseHCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-02-04HouseReturned to Committee of Origin (H) - Ways and Means AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-04HouseVoted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H)
2020-02-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-30HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2020-01-30HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-29HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-29HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-15HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-09HouseReferred: Ways and Means(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-01-06HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback