MO HB1951 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-13 - Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to automobile insurance verification for food delivery platform drivers
Title
Creates provisions relating to automobile insurance verification for food delivery platform drivers
Sponsors
Rep. Ian Mackey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) |
2022-01-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2022-01-05 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |