MO HB1944 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an income tax return check-off box for the designation of a donation from an income tax refund to the newly created Pediatric Cancer Research Trust Fund
Title
Authorizes an income tax return check-off box for the designation of a donation from an income tax refund to the newly created Pediatric Cancer Research Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2012-03-21 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1944&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1944I.htm |