MO HB1941 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Office of Administration to maintain specified financial records of the Missouri Employers Mutual Insurance Company on the Missouri Accountability Portal
Title
Requires the Office of Administration to maintain specified financial records of the Missouri Employers Mutual Insurance Company on the Missouri Accountability Portal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Refer: Spec Stand Com Government Oversight & Accountability | |
2012-03-21 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1941&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1941I.htm |