MO HB1940 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Missouri Employers Mutual Insurance Company to transition into a private mutual insurance company before January 1, 2014
Title
Requires the Missouri Employers Mutual Insurance Company to transition into a private mutual insurance company before January 1, 2014
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Refer: Spec Stand Com Government Oversight & Accountability | |
2012-03-21 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1940&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1940I.htm |