MO HB1937 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to proxy voting and fiduciary investment duties for certain public employee retirement and pension systems
Title
Modifies provisions related to proxy voting and fiduciary investment duties for certain public employee retirement and pension systems
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Owen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2024-03-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-03-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-13 | House | Prefiled (H) |