MO HB1937 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various Supreme Court Rules relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Modifies various Supreme Court Rules relating to criminal procedure.
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-03-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-03-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |