MO HB1936 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the accreditation requirements for reinsurance companies and specifies when an insurance company can take credit or reduce liability due to reinsurance
Title
Changes the laws regarding the accreditation requirements for reinsurance companies and specifies when an insurance company can take credit or reduce liability due to reinsurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-21 | Referred: Insurance Policy (H) | |
2012-03-19 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1936&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1936I.htm |