MO HB1935 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-19 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the application of a specific interest rate for specified late payments, repayments, loans, bonds, overpayments, and judgments
Title
Changes the laws regarding the application of a specific interest rate for specified late payments, repayments, loans, bonds, overpayments, and judgments
Sponsors
Rep. Ward Franz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-04-05 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-03 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-21 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2012-03-19 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |