MO HB1933 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health Care Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health Care Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Abortion Ban for Sex Selection and Genetic Abnormalities Act of 2012 to prohibit an abortion solely due to the sex of the unborn child or a genetic abnormality diagnosis
Title
Establishes the Abortion Ban for Sex Selection and Genetic Abnormalities Act of 2012 to prohibit an abortion solely due to the sex of the unborn child or a genetic abnormality diagnosis
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2012-03-19 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1933&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1933I.htm |