MO HB193 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the composition of Congressional districts based on the 2010 census
Title
Changes the composition of Congressional districts based on the 2010 census
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-05-04 | Passed over Veto (G) | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Votes to Override Veto (S) | |
2011-05-04 | House Votes to Override Veto (H) | |
2011-05-02 | Vetoed by Governor (G) | |
2011-04-27 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-04-27 | Constitutional Objection Filed (H) | |
2011-04-27 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) | |
2011-04-27 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-27 | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) | |
2011-04-27 | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) | |
2011-04-20 | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) | |
2011-04-14 | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference | |
2011-04-14 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Third Read and Passed (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Motion to Reconsider Defeated (S) | |
2011-04-13 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-04-12 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-04-12 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-11 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Read/Referred: Select Committee on Redistricting | |
2011-04-06 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-06 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Perfected (H) | |
2011-04-06 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-05 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-05 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-05 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-05 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-04-05 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-05 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-05 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-05 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Public Hearing Continued (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Public Hearing Continued (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Public Hearing Continued (H) | |
2011-03-02 | Public Hearing Continued (H) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Redistricting | |
2011-01-18 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-13 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |