MO HB192 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to the payment fines by offenders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to the payment fines by offenders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - House - House: HB 192 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 139 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: HB 192 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 138 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: HB 192 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2019-07-09HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2019-05-29HouseConstitutional Objection Filed (H)
2019-05-13HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-13HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 139 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-13HouseTaken Up
2019-05-13HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-13HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-05-09HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-05-09SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended
2019-05-09SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 6, SA 7
2019-05-09SenateSS Adopted (S)
2019-05-09SenateTaken Up
2019-05-07SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 Adopted/SA 5, SS pending
2019-05-07SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2019-05-07SenateTaken Up
2019-04-25SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-25SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-24SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 25, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2019-04-23SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-04-18SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-11SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-09SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 11, 2019, 9:45am, Pershing Conference Room
2019-04-02SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-03-28SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 2, 2019, 8:00am, SCR 1
2019-03-26SenateSecond read and referred: Government Reform(S)
2019-03-04HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-03-04HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 156 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 2
2019-03-04HouseTaken Up
2019-02-27HousePerfected (H)
2019-02-27HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-02-27HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-02-27HouseTaken Up
2019-02-21HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-21HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-21HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-14HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-02-14HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-14HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-07HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-31HouseReferred: Special Committee on Criminal Justice(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-04HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB192&year=2019&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0761H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0761H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0761H.02P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0761S.05C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0761S.08F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/0761S.08T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/031.003.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6505091112-1210.pdf#1119
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/068.012.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/068.011.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback