MO HB1906 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Workforce Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Workforce Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions governing the authorization of the deduction of moneys from the paychecks of public employees for the benefit of public labor organizations.
Title
Modifies provisions governing the authorization of the deduction of moneys from the paychecks of public employees for the benefit of public labor organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-24 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1906&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4573H.01I.pdf |