MO HB1891 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds provisions relating to statewide mechanical contractor licenses.
Title
Adds provisions relating to statewide mechanical contractor licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2020-03-12 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2020-02-20 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled (H) |