MO HB1888 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes education savings accounts
Title
Establishes education savings accounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2016-04-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-22 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2016-02-22 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2016-02-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1888&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1888I.PDF |