MO HB1887 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Children and Families(H)
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Children and Families(H)
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the mission of the department of health and senior services.
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the mission of the department of health and senior services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-23 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1887&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/4584H.01I.pdf |