MO HB188 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the "Narcotics Control Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "Narcotics Control Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House: HB 188 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 103 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: HB 188 (*HA 6) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 40 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - House: HB 188 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 110 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: HB 188 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 55 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - House: HB 188 (*HA 2) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 50 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - House - House: HB 188 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 42 N: 101 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-04-11SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-11SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-11SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-11SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-04-10SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 11, 2019, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room
2019-04-09SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-04SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-04SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-03-27SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, March 27, 2019, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
2019-03-07SenateSecond read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children(S)
2019-02-11HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-02-11HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 103 NOES: 53 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-11HouseTaken Up
2019-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-07HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-02-06HousePerfected (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-06HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-02-06HouseTaken Up
2019-02-04HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-04HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-04HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-31HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-01-31HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-01-30HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-16HouseReferred: Insurance Policy(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2018-12-04HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback