MO HB1873 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes civil penalties for poaching certain animals
Title
Imposes civil penalties for poaching certain animals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: HB 1873 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 130 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources(S) |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 19 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-21 | House | Perfected (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2018-02-21 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-17 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |