MO HB1864 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Social Services to implement an automated process to ensure applicants applying for benefit programs are eligible for such programs
Title
Requires the Department of Social Services to implement an automated process to ensure applicants applying for benefit programs are eligible for such programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred: Government Oversight and Accountability(H) |
2014-02-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1864&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1864I.htm |