MO HB1862 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes campsite occupancy limits in a campground in any state park
Title
Establishes campsite occupancy limits in a campground in any state park
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources(H) |
2014-02-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1862&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB1862I.htm |