MO HB1860 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a tax credit equal to 100% of the state sales tax paid on any motor vehicle assembled and purchased in Missouri
Title
Authorizes a tax credit equal to 100% of the state sales tax paid on any motor vehicle assembled and purchased in Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-04 | Referred: Job Creation and Economic Development (H) | |
2010-02-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1860&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1860I.htm |