MO HB1857 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-12 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Firemen's Retirement System of St. Louis for persons hired on or after August 29, 2012
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Firemen's Retirement System of St. Louis for persons hired on or after August 29, 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Leara [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-19 | Public Hearing Continued (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Referred: Retirement (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1857&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1857I.htm |